MD HB922 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying the eligibility of certain members of the State Retirement and Pension System for certain death benefits when COVID-19 caused or contributed to the death of a member; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to accept the death of a member as arising out of or in the course of the actual performance of duty under certain circumstances; requiring the Board, under certain circumstances, to discontinue payment of a certain allowance and begin payment of a certain special death benefit allowance; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Retirement and Pension System - COVID-19-Related Death Benefits - Clarification

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseReturned Passed
2021-04-01SenateThird Reading Passed (47-0)
2021-03-31SenateFavorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
2021-03-31SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2021-03-19SenateReferred Budget and Taxation
2021-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (136-0)
2021-03-18HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2021-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments {114666/1 Adopted
2021-03-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2021-02-06HouseHearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
2021-02-02HouseFirst Reading Appropriations

Same As/Similar To

SB642 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-08 - Returned Passed

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
State Personnel and Pensions20101(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback