MD HB921 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-11 - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the State Board of Education to require, beginning on or before July 1, 2017, specified school personnel to complete training in, by a method determined by the State Board after consultation with the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board, specified knowledge and skills required to understand and respond to the social, emotional, and personal development of students; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Primary and Secondary Education - School Personnel - Training Requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-11HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-17HouseHearing cancelled
2016-03-07HouseHearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-12HouseHearing cancelled
2016-03-03HouseHearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-10HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback