MD HB921 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-18 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to issue a certificate of completion to a specified offender who meets specified requirements; and requiring the Department to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2014, on the number of certificates of completion issued.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Certificate of Completion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-02-27 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Criminal Law - Procedure
Ex-Offenders
Fees
Fines
Parole and Probation
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Restitution
Ex-Offenders
Fees
Fines
Parole and Probation
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Restitution