MD HB92 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-10 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering to 4 feet the distance that the driver of a motor vehicle is required to maintain, except under specified circumstances, when passing a bicycle, an electric personal assistive mobility device (EPAMD), or a motor scooter.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vehicle Laws - Passing a Bicycle, an Electric Personal Assistive Mobility Device, or a Motor Scooter - Distance Requirement

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-10HouseUnfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
2014-01-28HouseHearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-08HouseFirst Reading Environmental Matters
2013-09-24HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback