MD HB919 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-21 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the property management company of each senior apartment housing facility located in a geographic focus area in Baltimore City designated by the Mayor's Office of Sustainable Solutions under the Mayor's Violence Reduction Initiative that is located in zip codes 21217 or 21223 to contract with a licensed security guard agency for the provision of security guard services at the senior apartment housing facility at all times that the property management company is not open for conducting business on the site; etc.
Title
Baltimore City – Senior Apartment Housing Facilities – Security Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {994162/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2019-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-08 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Apartments
Baltimore City
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
Elderly Persons
Law Enforcement
Real Property
Safety
Baltimore City
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
Elderly Persons
Law Enforcement
Real Property
Safety