MD HB918 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a person to have a specified license before doing business as a buyer of personal property by means of an automated purchasing machine in the State; requiring applicants for a buyer's license and a resident agent of an applicant or a licensee to apply for a specified criminal history records check; requiring a buyer to ensure that each automated purchasing machine that the buyer owns or operates in the State meets requirements; requiring a buyer to use an individual screen transaction under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Automated Purchasing Machines - Licensing of Buyers and Required Records
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-28 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Cluster) {533827/1 Rejected (33-78) (Y: 33 N: 78 NV: 22 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McComas) {203828/1 Rejected (28-72) (Y: 28 N: 72 NV: 33 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Cluster) {533827/1 Rejected (33-78) (Y: 33 N: 78 NV: 22 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (McComas) {203828/1 Rejected (28-72) (Y: 28 N: 72 NV: 33 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-04 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2014-04-04 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {617379/2 Report Adopted |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate Cluster) {533827/1 Rejected (33-78) |
2014-03-15 | House | Floor Amendment (Delegate McComas) {203828/1 Rejected (28-72) |
2014-03-15 | House | Special Order until later today (Delegate McComas) Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {793798/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-02-05 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Appeals
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Equipment
Fees
Forms
Fraud
Hearings
Identification
Inspections
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Vending Machines
Work, Labor and Employment
Business Regulation and Occupations
Commerce and Business
Counties
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Background Investigations
Discipline
Equipment
Fees
Forms
Fraud
Hearings
Identification
Inspections
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Law Enforcement
Licenses
Minors
Municipal Corporations
Notices
Oaths
Penalties and Sentences
Personal Property
Privacy
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Storage
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Vending Machines
Work, Labor and Employment