MD HB915 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 365
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 365
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain hospitals to provide each patient with a certain written notice related to outpatient facility fees that are charged for services provided at the hospital that is in a certain form; requiring that certain notices be provided to certain patients in certain manners and at certain times; requiring certain hospitals to determine a certain range of fees and fee estimates; requiring each hospital that charges an outpatient facility fee to use a certain range of fees and fee estimates; etc.
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 365 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {346688/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-02-14 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB632 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 366
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Fees
Forms
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Insurance
internet
Language
Medical Assistance
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Postal Service
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telephones
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Fees
Forms
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Insurance
internet
Language
Medical Assistance
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Postal Service
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telephones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 349.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |