MD SB632 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 366
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 366
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain hospitals to provide each patient with a certain written notice related to outpatient facility fees that are charged for services provided at the hospital that is in a certain form; requiring that certain notices be provided to certain patients in certain manners and at certain times; requiring certain hospitals to determine the range of hospital outpatient facility fees and fee estimates; requiring a certain hospital that charges an outpatient facility fee to use a certain range of fees and fee estimates; etc.
Title
Health Facilities - Hospitals - Disclosure of Outpatient Facility Fees (Facility Fee Right-to-Know Act)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 366 |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Senate Concurs House Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted (128-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {876081/1 Adopted |
2020-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-16 | House | Referred Health and Government Operations |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {747276/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
Same As/Similar To
HB915 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 365
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Fees
Forms
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Insurance
internet
Language
Medical Assistance
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Postal Service
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telephones
Attorney General
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Electronic Communication
Fees
Forms
Health Care Facilities
Health Care Facilities and Regulation
Health Insurance
Health Services Cost Review Commission
Hospitals
Insurance
internet
Language
Medical Assistance
Minors
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Patients
Postal Service
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Telephones
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 19 | 349.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |