MD HB914 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the conditions for the award of certain multiyear contracts approved by resolution of the Commissioners of Calvert County.
Title
Calvert County - Procurement - Award of Multiyear Contracts
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 104 |
2022-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2022-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-03-11 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-23 | House | Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Calvert County
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
internet
Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Contracts
Counties - Local Laws
County Commissioners
internet
Procurement
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Calvert County | 6 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |