MD HB907 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the Town of Sykesville to purchase specified additional service credit for specified employees; requiring specified additional service credit to be credited to specified employees on July 1 of the fiscal year in which the additional service credit is purchased; requiring a specified adjustment to a specified new entrant valuation that is used to determine a specified employer contribution in the fiscal year in which a specified purchase of services credit is made; etc.
Title
Employees' Pension System - Town of Sykesville - Service Credit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 9:15 a.m. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2015-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {494463/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2015-02-24 | House | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |