MD HB904 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a trustee to send certain interested parties in a certain manner a certain report when the trust terminates or on the resignation or removal of the trustee in accordance with the terms of the trust or certain provisions of law; and providing that, if an interested party does not submit an objection to the report within 120 days after the trustee mailed the report, the interested party shall be deemed to have released the trustee and to have consented to and ratified the actions of the trustee; etc.
Title
Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 361 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {832216/1 Adopted |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB886 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 362
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Beneficiaries
Communications
Courts
Disclosure
Estates and Trusts
Fees
Liability
Notices
Postal Service
Reports
Time
Beneficiaries
Communications
Courts
Disclosure
Estates and Trusts
Fees
Liability
Notices
Postal Service
Reports
Time
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 5 | 904 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Estates and Trusts | 5 | 907 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |