MD HB904 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring that a summary of each nutrient management plan be filed and updated with the Department of Agriculture at certain times; authorizing the Department to require an updated summary to take the form of an annual implementation report; requiring a manure broker to provide certain information to a certain person; requiring a person who holds a certain certificate or license to comply with certain reporting requirements and deadlines related to implementation of the Phosphorus Management Tool; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agriculture - Nutrient Management - Monitoring and Enforcement

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (96-43) (Y: 97 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (96-43)
2019-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-16HouseMotion Special Order until 03/18 (Delegate Hartman) Rejected
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {710518/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-16HouseSpecial Order until later this session (Delegate Stein) Adopted
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {710518/1
2019-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-12HouseHearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-11HouseHearing canceled
2019-02-11HouseHearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback