MD HB9 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 393
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing a licensing and regulatory system for the practice of direct-entry midwifery under the State Board of Nursing; establishing the Direct-Entry Midwifery Advisory Committee; requiring the Committee, beginning on November 1, 2016, to submit a specified annual report to the Board; requiring the Department of Legislative Services, on or before December 1, 2016, to compile and analyze specified data, report on the data to specified committees of the General Assembly, and provide the data to the Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Licensure of Direct-Entry Midwives Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-05-12HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 393
2015-04-13HousePassed Enrolled
2015-04-13HouseThird Reading Passed (139-0)
2015-04-13HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2015-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2015-04-10SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-04-10SenateFavorable with Amendments {164533/1 Report Adopted
2015-04-09SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-03-23SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2015-03-23HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2015-03-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2015-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {116381/1 Report Adopted
2015-03-20HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2015-02-11HouseHearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2015-01-14HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations
2014-10-13HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0009&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2015rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0009f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0009t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/bills/hb/hb0009e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/Chapters_noln/CH_393_hb0009e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0009_11638101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2015RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0009_16453301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0009.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0009_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/votes_comm/hb0009_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2015RS/ag_letters/hb0009.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0009,h-0546&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0009,s-0967&stab=02&ys=2015RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0009,h-1130&stab=02&ys=2015RS

Bill Comments

feedback