MD HB9 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-02 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a food establishment, beginning March 1, 2014, to display a specified poster relating to food allergies; requiring, on or before January 1, 2014, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Restaurant Association of Maryland and Food Allergy Research and Education, to create and make available on its Web site a specified poster; establishing a Task Force to Study Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading; requiring a report on or before January 1, 2014; etc.
Title
Health - Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading - Posting Requirement and Task Force
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-1) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-02 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252 |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2013-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {396581/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-01-29 | House | Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-17 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
2012-11-08 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Diseases
Electronic Government
Food
Governor
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Holidays and Special Dates
Inspections
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Public Health
Reports
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Diseases
Electronic Government
Food
Governor
Health
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Holidays and Special Dates
Inspections
Job Training
Licenses
Notices
Public Health
Reports
Restaurants
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Signs and Billboards
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Work, Labor and Employment