MD HB9 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-02 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education, on or before December 1, 2015, and every 5 years thereafter, to report specified information to the Governor and the General Assembly concerning matters relating to student growth, health, and well-being; and encouraging county boards of education to incorporate specified lessons into the county boards' health education curriculum.
Title
Education - Children and Youth - Reporting of Information Concerning Student
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-04-01 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-30 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-02 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-30 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2012-03-29 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable with Amendments 854932/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-04-04 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-28 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-22 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-04-01 | Passed Enrolled | |
2012-04-01 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2012-04-01 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2012-03-22 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2012-03-20 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-20 | Favorable with Amendments 655766/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-21 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-11 | First Reading Ways and Means | |
2011-08-26 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Counties
Diseases
Domestic Violence
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health
Public Schools
Reports
Students
Violence
Diseases
Domestic Violence
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Health
Public Schools
Reports
Students
Violence