MD HB898 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB89
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-05 - Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Maryland People's Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring the interest earnings of the Fund to be credited to the Fund; and requiring the Comptroller to distribute to the Fund 25% of the Maryland estate tax.
Title
Maryland People's Fund - Establishment
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 12:30 p.m. |
2024-03-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-02-12 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m. |
2024-02-02 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB89 (Carry Over) 2023-01-11 - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Comptroller
Estate Tax
Interest
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Treasurers
Estate Tax
Interest
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Treasurers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 6 | 226 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 5 | 108 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Tax - General | 2 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0898?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0898f.pdf |