MD HB896 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the amount of taxable or tax exempt bonds that the Maryland Stadium Authority may issue for certain sports facilities at Camden Yards and the purposes for which the proceeds from those bonds may be utilized; specifying the maximum amount of bonds that may be issued for certain facilities; altering the amount that the Comptroller is required to distribute from the State Lottery Fund to the Maryland Stadium Facilities Fund; etc.
Title
Maryland Stadium Authority - Increase of Bond Authorization - Camden Yards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60 |
2022-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-0) |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 2:00 p.m. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 2:30 p.m. |
2022-04-08 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Hearing 4/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Rereferred to Budget and Taxation |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2022-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-10) |
2022-04-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {813022/1 Adopted |
2022-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2022-02-18 | House | Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-10 | House | Hearing canceled |
2022-02-09 | House | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-02-07 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Baltimore City
Bonds
Economic Development
Leases and Rent
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Bonds
Economic Development
Leases and Rent
Revenue and Taxes
Sports and Recreation
Stadium Authority
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 628 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 644 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 120 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |