MD HB893 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - First Reading Senate Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim the month of August as Caribbean Heritage Month in recognition of the contributions that Caribbean Americans have made to the State; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Caribbean Heritage Month in Maryland properly with appropriate programs, ceremonies, and activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

General Provisions – Commemorative Months – Caribbean Heritage Month

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-27HouseThird Reading Passed (137-0)
2019-03-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {896689/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-02-08HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-08HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback