MD HB892 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a Class MT (movie theater) license in Harford County; authorizing the Harford County Board of License Commissioners to issue the license to an owner of a movie theater; requiring the owner of a movie theater, in order to be eligible for the license, to provide documentation to the Board that the owner has made an investment of at least $250,000 in the movie theater; specifying that the license entitles the holder to sell beer, wine and liquor for on-premises consumption; specifying an annual license fee of $500; etc.
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Movie Theater License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 135 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 429 |
2016-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2016-03-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {933194/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2016-02-22 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-10 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Disclosure
Education
Fees
Food
Harford County
Investments
License Commissioners, Boards of
Motion Pictures
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Beverage Containers
Boundaries
Disclosure
Education
Fees
Food
Harford County
Investments
License Commissioners, Boards of
Motion Pictures
Retail Sales