MD HB890 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-6)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an Overdose Response Program overseen by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene; requiring the Department to adopt regulations and authorizing the Department to take other actions; specifying the requirements an individual must meet to qualify for a specified certificate; authorizing a certified individual to receive a prescription for naloxone and supplies, possess prescribed naloxone and supplies, and administer naloxone, under specified circumstances, to specified individuals; etc.
Title
Health - Overdose Response Program - Establishment
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (123-0) (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2013-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-0) |
2013-04-06 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {307471/1 Report Adopted |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings |
2013-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2013-03-22 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments {326187/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Community Facilities and Services
Drugs
Education
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Equipment
Fees
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Liability
Licenses
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment
Drugs
Education
Emergencies
Emergency Medical Services
Equipment
Fees
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Liability
Licenses
Nurses
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Physicians
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Substance Abuse
Volunteers
Work, Labor and Employment