MD HB89 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 46
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the County Commissioners of St. Mary's County to designate an emergency snow route and to regulate travel and the presence of vehicles on an emergency snow route during a snow emergency.
Title
St. Mary's County - Emergency Snow Routes - Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 46 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Abandoned Vehicles
Emergencies
Highways
Local Government - Generally
Parking
St. Mary's County
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Weather
Emergencies
Highways
Local Government - Generally
Parking
St. Mary's County
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Weather
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 12 | 535 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |