MD HB89 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for a maximum fine of $500 for a violation of certain prohibitions against using a handheld telephone while driving a motor vehicle; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - Use of Handheld Telephone While Driving - Penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (83-58) (Y: 84 N: 59 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (83-58) |
2019-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-17 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Accidents
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Law Enforcement
Mobile Devices
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Telephones
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Law Enforcement
Mobile Devices
Motor Vehicle Operation
Motor Vehicles
Penalties and Sentences
Safety
Telephones
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Rules of the Road