MD HB89 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain requirement that the State Department of Assessments and Taxation be responsible for certain administrative duties relating to a credit against the county or municipal corporation property tax imposed on a certain dwelling that is owned by a certain public safety officer under certain circumstances; providing that a certain property tax credit may not exceed the lesser of $2,500 per dwelling or the amount of property tax imposed on the dwelling; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Public Safety Officers - Administration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-15 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 654 |
2018-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2018-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {609634/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-15 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-12 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Assessments and Taxation, Department of
Correctional Officers
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Sheriffs
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property
Correctional Officers
Counties
Emergency Medical Services
Fire Protection
Law Enforcement
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Sheriffs
Tax Credits
Taxes - Property