MD HB89 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-01 - Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Extending from January 1, 2017, to January 1, 2022, the termination of an income tax credit that specified individuals or corporations may claim against the State income tax for costs incurred to obtain federal security clearances, to rent specified facilities, and to construct or renovate a sensitive compartmented information facility.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Security Clearances - Employer Costs - Extension
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-01-16 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Construction
Corporations
Equipment
Federal Government
Income Tax
Leases and Rent
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Corporations
Equipment
Federal Government
Income Tax
Leases and Rent
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income