MD HB887 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-10)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting specified insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations from applying a preauthorization requirement for a prescription drug to be used for treatment of an opioid use disorder and that contains methadone, buprenorphine, or naltrexone; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after the effective date of the Act.
Title
Health Insurance - Prior Authorization for Drug Products to Treat an Opioid Use Disorder - Prohibition
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (141-0) (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 581 |
2017-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2017-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (141-0) |
2017-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-15 | House | Floor Committee Amendment {286185/1 Adopted |
2017-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {796789/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2017-03-02 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Contracts
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Drugs
Emergency Bills
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Pharmacy Benefits Managers
Public Health
Substance Abuse