MD HB883 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-04 - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a judge, in a final protective order, to order the respondent to remain a specified distance away from the residence, place of employment, school, or temporary residence of a person eligible for relief.
Title
Family Law - Protective Orders - Additional Relief
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-09 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-08 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | |
2012-03-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | |
2012-02-09 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Judiciary |