MD HB881 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Agriculture, on or before July 1, 2016, to conduct a comprehensive assessment of the impacts of climate change on agriculture in the State; requiring the University of Maryland Center for Environmental Science to establish specified sea level rise projections; requiring the Secretary of Natural Resources to update Maryland Environmental Policy Act guidelines; altering the State's Economic Growth, Resource Protection, and Planning Policy to include the consideration of climate change risks; etc.
Title
Maryland Shoreline Risk Assessment, Preparation, and Adaptation Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2015-03-04 | House | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Annapolis
Assessments
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Environment
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Erosion
Flood Control
Highways
Insects
Laws and Ordinances
Maps and Charts
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Ocean City
Planning, Department of
Public Information
State Universities and Colleges
Water
Weather
Zoning and Planning
Agriculture, Department of
Annapolis
Assessments
Baltimore City
Committees and Commissions
Electronic Government
Environment
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Erosion
Flood Control
Highways
Insects
Laws and Ordinances
Maps and Charts
Municipal Corporations
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Ocean City
Planning, Department of
Public Information
State Universities and Colleges
Water
Weather
Zoning and Planning