MD HB881 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-13-2)
Status: Passed on April 14 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-14 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the purpose of the Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission to include approval of physicians, development of a Web site, establishment of an application review process, and issuance of medical marijuana grower licenses; authorizing a medical marijuana grower to distribute marijuana at specified facilities; identifying patients and caregivers; requiring the Commission to report to the General Assembly on the level of competition in the market for medical marijuana on or before December 1, 2015; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Marijuana - Natalie M. LaPrade Medical Marijuana Commission

Sponsors

Del. Cheryl Glenn [D]Del. Dan Morhaim [D]Del. Curtis Anderson [D]Del. Sam Arora [D]
Del. Kumar Barve [D]Del. Elizabeth Bobo [D]Del. Joseph Boteler [R]Del. Talmadge Branch [D]
Del. Aisha Braveboy [D]Del. Rudolph Cane [D]Del. Jon Cardin [D]Del. Alfred Carr [D]
Sen. Jill Carter [D]Del. Galen Clagett [D]Del. Bonnie Cullison [D]Del. John Donoghue [D]
Del. Kathleen Dumais [D]Del. Donald Dwyer [R]Del. Donald Elliott [R]Del. William Frank [R]
Del. David Fraser-hidalgo [D]Del. Glen Glass [R]Sen. Guy Guzzone [D]Del. Keith Haynes [D]
Del. Sheila Hixson [D]Del. Patrick Hogan [R]Del. James Hubbard [D]Del. Tom Hucker [D]
Del. Jolene Ivey [D]Del. Wade Kach [R]Del. Ariana Kelly [D]Del. Stephen Lafferty [D]
Del. Maggie McIntosh [D]Del. Herbert McMillan [R]Del. Aruna Miller [D]Del. Joseph Minnick [D]
Del. Heather Mizeur [D]Del. Peter Murphy [D]Del. Doyle Niemann [D]Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D]
Sen. Justin Ready [R]Del. Kirill Reznik [D]Sen. Barbara Robinson [D]Del. Shane Robinson [D]
Del. Michael Smigiel [R]Del. Dana Stein [D]Del. Darren M. Swain [?]Del. Shawn Tarrant [D]
Del. Frank Turner [D]Del. Veronica Turner [D]Del. Kriselda Valderrama [D]Sen. Jeff Waldstreicher [D]
Sen. Mary Washington [D]Del. Michael Weir [D]Sen. Craig Zucker [D]Del. Peter Hammen [D]
Del. Shane Pendergrass [D]Del. Eric Bromwell [D]Del. Robert Costa [R]Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R]
Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D]Del. Joseline Pena-Melnyk [D]Del. Ben Barnes [D]Sen. Pamela Beidle [D]
Del. Steven DeBoy [D]Del. Barbara Frush [D]Del. James Gilchrist [D]Del. Ana Gutierrez [D]
Del. Nina R. Harper [?]Del. Carolyn Howard [D]Del. Anne Kaiser [D]Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D]
Del. Tony McConkey [R]Del. Keiffer Mitchell [D]Del. Luiz Simmons [D]Del. Melvin Stukes [D]
Del. Michael Summers [D]Del. Michael Vaughn [D]Del. Alonzo Washington [D]Del. C.T. Wilson [D]

Roll Calls

2014-04-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (125-11) (Y: 125 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-2) (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-1) (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (126-10) (Y: 126 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Floor - Floor Amendment (Schulz) {613127/1 Rejected (33-82) (Y: 33 N: 82 NV: 18 Abs: 8) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-04-14HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 240
2014-04-07HousePassed Enrolled
2014-04-07SenateThird Reading Passed (44-2)
2014-04-07SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2014-04-07HouseThird Reading Passed (125-11)
2014-04-07HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2014-04-07SenateSenators Raskin, Brochin, and Shank
2014-04-07SenateConference Committee Appointed
2014-04-07SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2014-04-05HouseDelegates Morhaim, Hammen, and Kach
2014-04-05HouseConference Committee Appointed
2014-04-05HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2014-04-05HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2014-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-1)
2014-04-02SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments {528178/1 Report Adopted
2014-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2014-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2014-03-17HouseThird Reading Passed (126-10)
2014-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2014-03-15HouseFloor Amendment (Delegate Schulz) {613127/1 Rejected (33-82)
2014-03-15HouseSpecial Order until later today (Delegate Schulz) Adopted
2014-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {486688/1 Report Adopted
2014-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2014-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 12:30 p.m.
2014-02-26HouseHearing cancelled
2014-02-28HouseHearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-19HouseHearing cancelled
2014-03-11HouseHearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-02-05HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0881&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2014rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0881f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0881t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/bills/hb/hb0881e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/Chapters_noln/CH_240_hb0881e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0881_48668801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0881_61312701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0881_52817801.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0881_78352201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2014RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0881_11342101.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/fnotes/bil_0001/hb0881.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0881_hgo.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/votes_comm/hb0881_jpr.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2014RS/amds/bil_0001/hb0881_11342101.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0881,h-0569&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0881,h-0686&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0881,s-0988&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0881,s-1211&stab=02&ys=2014RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0881,h-1311&stab=02&ys=2014RS

Bill Comments

feedback