MD HB88 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-9)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-09 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program to review prescription monitoring data for indications of a possible misuse or abuse of a monitored prescription drug; requiring the Program to report the possible misuse or abuse to the prescriber or dispenser of the monitored prescription drug and to provide certain education to the prescriber or dispenser; authorizing the Program to provide prescription monitoring data to the Office of Controlled Substances Administration for further investigation; etc.
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Monitoring Program - Revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0) |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {587278/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-04-05 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-04-04 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2018-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {166883/1 Report Adopted |
2018-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Data
Drugs
Health
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Notices
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Reports
Substance Abuse
Committees and Commissions
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Data
Drugs
Health
Health Occupations
Law Enforcement
Notices
Pharmacists and Pharmacies
Public Health
Reports
Substance Abuse