MD HB88 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-24 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding the applicability of specified provisions of law relating to the Motor Vehicle Administration's collection and forwarding of Selective Service registration information to women and specified minors; altering the conditions under which specified information about an applicant is forwarded to the Selective Service System; repealing specified provisions relating to federal funds for the collection and electronic forwarding of Selective Service registration information; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card Applicants
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-24 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters |
2014-01-28 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
2013-09-16 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Armed Forces
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Forms
Identification
Minors
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Women
Youth
Drivers' Licenses
Electronic Government
Federal Government
Forms
Identification
Minors
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Registration
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Women
Youth