MD HB879 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 586
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, rather than requiring, the State Board of Physicians to reinstate, under specified circumstances, the license of a polysomnographic technologist; repealing the requirement that the Board place a licensed polysomnographic technologist on inactive status under specified circumstances; authorizing the Board, subject to a specified provision of law, to deny a license or take specified action against a licensee for failing to cooperate with a lawful investigation conducted by the Board; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Occupations - Polysomnographic Technologists - Licensure and Discipline

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-16HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 586
2013-04-06HouseReturned Passed
2013-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (44-0)
2013-04-05SenateSecond Reading Passed
2013-04-05SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2013-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-03-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2013-03-23HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2013-03-22HouseSecond Reading Passed
2013-03-22HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2013-03-21HouseFavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
2013-03-12HouseHearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2013-02-07HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback