MD HB87 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-28 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the student member of the Montgomery County Board of Education to attend an executive session of the Board of Education that relates to a specified matter; and authorizing the student member of the Montgomery County Board of Education to vote on specified matters.
Title
Montgomery County Board of Education - Student Member - Voting MC 11-16
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (39-4) (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-8) (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-8) (Y: 131 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-28 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716 |
2016-03-31 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (39-4) |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Hershey) Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-8) |
2016-02-23 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-02-23 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-02-22 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |