MD HB87 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Anne Arundel County Board of Education from paying monetary compensation to the county superintendent of schools for sick leave benefits earned while employed by any other board of education or public school system.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Superintendent of Schools - Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (133-0) (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 336 |
2014-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-10 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (133-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {245962/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2013-11-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Leave
Public Officials
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment
Education - Local Bills
Education, Boards of
Leave
Public Officials
Public Schools
Salaries and Compensation
Work, Labor and Employment