MD HB867 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City from selling property to enforce a lien for unpaid charges for water and sewer service under specified circumstances.
Title
Baltimore City - Sale of Property to Enforce Lien for Water and Sewer Service
Sponsors
Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Luke Clippinger [D] | Del. Frank Conaway [D] |
Del. Cheryl Glenn [D] | Del. Peter Hammen [D] | Sen. Nathaniel Oaks [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-04 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-03 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-03 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2011-04-05 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2011-02-11 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-11 | First Reading Environmental Matters |