MD HB863 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring an advanced practice registered nurse who qualifies for certification by the State Board of Nursing by having a multistate licensure privilege under the Nurse Licensure Compact to, at all times, ensure that the Board has certain documentation; authorizing a nurse anesthetist to perform certain functions; requiring a nurse anesthetist to ensure that a certain anesthesia provider performs a certain assessment, obtains certain consent, and formulates a certain plan; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Nursing - Advanced Practice Registered Nurses - Certification and Practice

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 483
2018-04-09HouseReturned Passed
2018-04-09SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2018-04-09SenateSenate Recede
2018-04-09SenateCommittee Amendment {274138/1 Withdrawn
2018-04-09SenateMotion Recede (Senator Conway) Adopted
2018-04-05HouseDelegates Kelly, Cullison, and Saab
2018-04-05HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-04-05HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2018-04-05HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2018-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2018-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-04-03SenateFavorable with Amendments {274138/1 Report Adopted
2018-04-02SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-29SenateHearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-03-19SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2018-03-19HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2018-03-16HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments {636287/1 Report Adopted
2018-03-16HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2018-02-22HouseHearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
2018-02-02HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0863&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2018rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0863f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/bills/hb/hb0863t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/Chapters_noln/CH_483_hb0863t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0863_63628701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2018RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0863_27413801.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0863.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0863_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/House/0641.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes_comm/hb0863_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1102.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2018RS/votes/Senate/1310.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback