MD HB861 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-09 - Hearing cancelled
Pending: House Health and Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that regulations adopted by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene include a requirement that the process for approval of a license for an opioid maintenance program include the number of existing slots in programs in a catchment area and the number of individuals in need of specified services in a catchment area, the severity of drug-related crime in a catchment area, the population at risk of opioid addiction in a catchment area, and the need for an opiod maintenance program in a specified catchment area; etc.
Title
Public Health - Opioid Maintenance Programs - Licensing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-10 | House | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-02 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-03 | House | Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Assessments
Boundaries
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Licenses
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse
Boundaries
Controlled Dangerous Substances
Crimes and Punishments
Fees
Health and Mental Hygiene, Department of
Licenses
Public Health
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Substance Abuse