MD HB860 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a credit against the State income tax for the amount certain individuals pay toward certain student loans during the taxable year; providing for the carryforward of the credit; authorizing certain individuals, on or before December 1 each year, to apply to the Department of Commerce for the credit; requiring the application to contain certain information; requiring the Department and the Maryland Higher Education Commission jointly to review the applications and award the tax credits; applying the Act; etc.
Title
Income Tax Credit - Individuals Working in STEM Fields - Student Loan Payments
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Kramer [D] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Barrie Ciliberti [R] | Del. Ana Gutierrez [D] |
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] | Sen. Karen Lewis Young [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-20 | House | Hearing canceled |
2018-03-07 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-02-02 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Commerce, Department of
Engineers
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Taxes - Income
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Engineers
Health Occupations
Higher Education
Higher Education Commission
Income Tax
Industry and Technology
Loans
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Scholarships and Student Financial Aid
Taxes - Income
Telecommunications and Information Technology