MD HB860 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting an owner of a vessel from placing the vessel or having the vessel placed in a lake at a public launch ramp or public dock after April 1, 2017, unless the owner has taken specified actions; establishing penalties for violation of the Act; requiring the Department of Natural Resources to convene a specified workgroup to evaluate actions that reduce the spread of aquatic invasive species from vessels placed in lakes that are owned or managed by the State; etc.
Title
Aquatic Invasive Species - Decontamination of Vessels (State Lakes Invasive Species Act of 2015)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-25) (Y: 112 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-28) (Y: 112 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-1) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-28) (Y: 112 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461 |
2015-04-13 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2015-04-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-25) |
2015-04-13 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-1) |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-04-10 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {574333/1 Report Adopted |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed (112-28) |
2015-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {850215/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2015-03-06 | House | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Aquaculture
Boats and Ships
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Fish and Fishing
Inspections
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Piers and Docks
Reports
Rivers and Streams
Rules and Regulations
Water
Boats and Ships
Committees and Commissions
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Fish and Fishing
Inspections
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Penalties and Sentences
Piers and Docks
Reports
Rivers and Streams
Rules and Regulations
Water