MD HB86 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 7 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-07 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering certain provisions of law related to the calculation of a certain budget increase for the Washington Metropolitan Area Transit Authority; and altering the information that the Authority must submit to the Department of Transportation as part of its yearly performance and condition assessments and reports to include certain single audit reports issued in accordance with certain requirements.
Title
Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
Sponsors
Del. Marc Korman [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-28 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 96 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-07 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-14) |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2020-02-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (96-41) |
2020-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Motion Special Order until 2/26 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {864966/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-17 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB136 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-28 - Hearing 2/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Arbitration
Auditors and Audits
Boundaries
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Disclosure
Examinations
Highways
internet
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Records
Reports
Safety
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Arbitration
Auditors and Audits
Boundaries
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Disclosure
Examinations
Highways
internet
Maps and Charts
Mass Transit
Records
Reports
Safety
Time
Transportation
Transportation - Generally
Zoning and Planning
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Transportation | 10 | 205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |