MD HB86 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide reimbursement for certain services of a dietitian or nutritionist under certain circumstances for the treatment of prediabetes and obesity; requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for certain equipment, supplies, training, and services for the treatment of elevated or impaired blood glucose levels induced by pregnancy or prediabetes; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Elevated or Impaired Blood Glucose Levels, Prediabetes, and Obesity Treatment
Sponsors
Del. Erek Barron [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 432 |
2018-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2018-03-29 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2018-03-28 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2018-03-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {976383/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-01-31 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m. |
2018-01-12 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Chemical Tests
Contracts
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Diseases
Education
Equipment
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Patients
Pregnancy
Reimbursement Rates
Time
Contracts
Dietitians and Nutritionists
Diseases
Education
Equipment
Health Insurance
Health Maintenance Organizations
Health Occupations
Health Planning and Cost Review
Insurance - Health
Nonprofit Organizations
Patients
Pregnancy
Reimbursement Rates
Time