MD HB86 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-02-19 - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishing the Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Program; providing for the purpose of the Program; providing that participation in the Program by a local school system is voluntary; providing that beginning with the graduating class of 2015, specified students shall receive a Seal of Biliteracy under specified circumstances; requiring the State Board of Education to establish criteria and requirements on or before October 1, 2014; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education - Maryland Seal of Biliteracy Act - Establishment

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-19HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-17HouseHearing cancelled
2014-01-29HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2014-01-08HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means
2013-11-15HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback