MD HB856 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Making it a civil offense, subject to specified penalties, for a specified person acting in a professional capacity to fail to report child abuse under specified circumstances; making it a misdemeanor, subject to specified penalties, for a specified person acting in a professional capacity to fail to report child abuse under specified circumstances; authorizing a police officer to issue a citation for a specified civil violation under the Act; etc.
Title
Child Abuse and Neglect - Failure to Report - Penalties and Training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn |
2015-03-16 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-03-19 | House | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-13 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Child Abuse and Neglect
Child Care
Citations
Civil Actions
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Electronic Government
Family Law
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Human Resources, Department of
Job Training
Juvenile Facilities
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Social Workers
Teachers
Child Care
Citations
Civil Actions
Counselors
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Electronic Government
Family Law
Fines
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hospitals
Human Resources, Department of
Job Training
Juvenile Facilities
Law Enforcement
Minors
Penalties and Sentences
Physicians
Private Schools
Public Schools
Reports
Sexual Offenses
Social Workers
Teachers