MD HB850 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-12 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a council of unit owners to petition the District Court for relief if a unit owner has failed to pay assessments and fees for 90 days or longer and is renting the unit to a tenant; requiring a certified copy of the petition to be mailed to the unit owner and served on the tenant in a specified manner; authorizing the District Court, after a hearing, to enter an order directing the tenant to pay rent due under the lease to the council of unit owners or a designated custodian; etc.
Title
Real Property - Condominiums - Payment of Assessments and Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2012-03-09 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | |
2012-03-08 | Special Order until 3/9 (Delegate McConkey) Adopted | |
2012-03-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable Report by Environmental Matters | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Assessments
Attorneys' Fees
Condominiums
Court Costs
District Courts
Fees
Hearings
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Petitions
Attorneys' Fees
Condominiums
Court Costs
District Courts
Fees
Hearings
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Petitions