MD HB85 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring specified school personnel to provide the parents of a child with a disability written information that the parents may use to contact early intervention and special education family support services staff members and a brief description of the available services; requiring that, if a parent's native language is not English, the information is to be provided to the specified parent in the parent's native language; requiring a local school system to publish specified contact information on its Web site; etc.
Title
Education - Children With Disabilities - Support Services - Parental Notification
Sponsors
Del. Eric Luedtke [D] | Del. Alfred Carr [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Sheila Hixson [D] |
Del. James Tarlau [D] | Sen. Craig Zucker [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-1) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-26 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250 |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-26 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2016-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-1) |
2016-02-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-02-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {545267/1 Report Adopted |
2016-02-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. |
2016-01-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Disabilities
Education
Electronic Government
Language
Minors
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Special Education
Education
Electronic Government
Language
Minors
Notices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Information
Public Schools
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Special Education