MD HB85 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-09 - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that the name of each candidate seeking election to the Montgomery County Board of Education appear on the primary election ballot if the number of candidates seeking election to the county board is equal to or less than the number of nominations available in a primary election.
Title
Montgomery County - Board of Education - Primary Election Ballots MC 6-15
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-09 | House | Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn |
2015-02-10 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2015-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |