MD HB849 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a health care provider or a representative of the health care provider from charging a fee for providing copies of a medical record requested by a certain person and that will be used for the purpose of filing a claim regarding or appealing a denial of Social Security Disability income or Social Security benefits under Title II or Title XVI of the Social Security Act.
Title
Public Health - Medical Records - Fees
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-06 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 135 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 157 |
2021-04-06 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-06 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2021-04-06 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {557475/1 Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2021-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {583628/1 Adopted |
2021-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2021-02-11 | House | Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-29 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Fees
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Health, Department of
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 4 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |