MD HB849 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting certain rates from taking effect without prior approval from the Maryland Insurance Commissioner; altering the definition of "insurer" for the purposes of certain provisions of law governing the People's Insurance Counsel to include property and casualty insurers; requiring the Commissioner to collect a certain annual assessment from each property and casualty insurer; requiring the People's Insurance Counsel Division to review certain rate increases filed with the Commissioner by a property and casualty insurer; etc.
Title
Insurance - Rate Effectiveness and People's Insurance Counsel Division
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn |
2020-02-26 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Certifications
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Personal Property
Prices
Property Damage
Real Property
Records
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Fees
Health Insurance
Insurance
Insurance - Health
Insurance - Other than Health
Insurance Administration
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund
Personal Property
Prices
Property Damage
Real Property
Records
Revenue and Taxes
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Insurance | 11 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 301 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 304 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 306 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |