MD HB849 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on April 26 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-26 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 175
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering specified requirements relating to carbon monoxide alarms as the requirements apply to rental dwelling units; requiring specified rental dwelling units, on or after April 1, 2018, to have a specified carbon monoxide alarm installed within the dwelling outside and in the immediate vicinity of each separate specified sleeping area, and on every level of the unit, including the basement; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Rental Dwelling Units - Carbon Monoxide Alarms

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-04-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-4) (Y: 137 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-08 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-7) (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-04-26HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 175
2016-04-11HousePassed Enrolled
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2016-04-11SenateConference Committee Report Adopted
2016-04-11HouseThird Reading Passed (137-4)
2016-04-11HouseConference Committee Report Adopted
2016-04-11SenateSenators Waugh, Kagan, and Salling
2016-04-11SenateConference Committee Appointed
2016-04-11SenateSenate Refuses to Recede
2016-04-11HouseDelegates Holmes, Anderton, and McCray
2016-04-11HouseConference Committee Appointed
2016-04-11HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2016-04-11HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2016-04-11SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
2016-04-07SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments {844137/2 Report Adopted
2016-04-07SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2016-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (129-7)
2016-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2016-03-08HouseFavorable with Amendments {610212/1 Report Adopted
2016-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2016-02-23HouseHearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
2016-02-08HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0849&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2016rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0849f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0849t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/bills/hb/hb0849e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/Chapters_noln/CH_175_hb0849e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0849_61021201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0849_84413702.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0849_67312001.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2016RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0849_74362501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/fnotes/bil_0009/hb0849.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0849_env.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/votes_comm/hb0849_ehe.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2016RS/amds/bil_0009/hb0849_74362501.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0849,h-0342&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0849,s-1246&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0849,h-1478&stab=02&ys=2016RS
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?pid=flrvotepage&tab=subject3&id=hb0849,s-1409&stab=02&ys=2016RS

Bill Comments

feedback