MD HB849 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a council of unit owners, only in a condominium regime established on or after October 1, 2013, to have the ability to allocate utility costs for water, electricity, gas, or oil service to each unit based on usage and to grant or deny utility service to each unit.
Title
Real Property - Condominiums - Allocation of Utility Costs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-12 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-02-13 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-09 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0849.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0849f.pdf |