MD HB849 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-12 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Clarifying that a person may sell or install smoke detectors, smoke alarms, and specialized smoke alarms for the deaf and hard of hearing only in accordance with the State Fire Prevention Code; repealing a requirement that each manufacturer that commercially sells or offers for sale a smoke detection system obtain approval of each model of smoke detector from the State Fire Marshal; and repealing a specified application fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Safety - Smoke Detectors and Smoke Alarms

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-12 Approved by the Governor
2011-03-31 Third Reading Passed (46-0)
2011-03-30 Second Reading Passed
2011-03-30 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-04-01 Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-03-21 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-03-18 First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs
2011-03-31 Returned Passed
2011-03-17 Third Reading Passed (139-0)
2011-03-15 Second Reading Passed
2011-03-15 Favorable Report Adopted
2011-03-14 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
2011-02-11 Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m.
2011-02-11 First Reading Environmental Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback